Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Malandrino

Bishop Emeritus of Noto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jul 1931 BornPachino
19 Mar 195523.7Ordained PriestPriest of Noto, Italy
30 Nov 197948.4AppointedBishop of Acireale, Italy
26 Jan 198048.5Ordained BishopBishop of Acireale, Italy
24 Feb 198048.6InstalledBishop of Acireale, Italy
19 Jun 199866.9AppointedBishop of Noto, Italy
29 Aug 199867.1InstalledBishop of Noto, Italy
16 Jul 200776.0RetiredBishop of Noto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Malandrino:
Bishop Giuseppe Malandrino (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Noto

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Noto.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 16 Jul 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 124, Number 11,174
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013