Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Salvatore Cassisa

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Monreale


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Dec 1921BornTrapani
3 Sep 194422.7Ordained PriestPriest
1 Dec 197351.9AppointedBishop of Cefal¨, Italy
24 Jan 197452.1Ordained BishopBishop of Cefal¨, Italy
11 Mar 197856.2AppointedArchbishop of Monreale, Italy
24 May 199775.4RetiredArchbishop of Monreale, Italy
3 Aug 201593.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Monreale, Italy

MicroData Summary for Salvatore Cassisa:
Archbishop Salvatore Cassisa (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Monreale

  • a priest for 70.9 years
  • a bishop for 41.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 3 Aug 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.8, 27 Jul 2015; Data: 4 Aug 2015