Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Guido Luigi Bentivoglio, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Catania, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 May 1899Born
9 Jun 191516.0ProfessedMember of Order of Cistercians
10 Jun 192223.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Cistercians
27 Jul 193940.1AppointedBishop of Avellino, Italy
24 Aug 193940.2Ordained BishopBishop of Avellino, Italy
30 Mar 194949.8AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Catania, Italy
30 Mar 194949.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Laodicea in Syria
3 Apr 195252.8SucceededArchbishop of Catania, Italy
16 Jul 197475.1RetiredArchbishop of Catania, Italy
8 Dec 197879.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Catania, Italy

MicroData Summary for Guido Luigi Bentivoglio (VIAF: 88607782)
Archbishop Guido Luigi Bentivoglio O. Cist. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Catania

EventPlace
Birth PlaceViterbo

  • a priest for 56.4 years
  • a bishop for 39.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1939, Number 40
  • qoci: CB, 1 Dec 2016
  • prof: CB, 15 Jul 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 17 Jul 2017