Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francisco Montecillo Padilla

Apostolic Nuncio to Guatemala

Titular Archbishop of Nebbio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Sep 1953 Born
21 Oct 197623.0Ordained PriestPriest of Cebu, Philippines
1 Apr 200652.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nebbio
1 Apr 200652.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Papua New Guinea
1 Apr 200652.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Solomon Islands
23 May 200652.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Nebbio
10 Nov 201158.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Tanzania
5 Apr 201662.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Kuwait
5 Apr 201662.5AppointedApostolic Delegate to Arabian Peninsula
26 Apr 201662.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Bahrain
26 Apr 201662.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to United Arab Emirates
30 Jul 201662.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Yemen
6 May 201763.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Qatar
17 Apr 202066.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Guatemala

MicroData Summary for Francisco Montecillo Padilla
Archbishop Francisco Montecillo Padilla (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Guatemala

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCebu City
Ordained BishopCathedral, Cebu, Archdiocese of Cebu, Philippines

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Guatemala.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 1 Apr 2006
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 185, Number 15,160
  • ab: Bollettino, 10 Nov 2011
  • ab: Bollettino, 5 Apr 2016
  • ab: Bollettino, 26 Apr 2016
  • ab: Bollettino, 30 Jul 2016
  • ab: Bollettino, 6 May 2017
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ab: Bollettino, 17 Apr 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 17 Apr 2020

Quantcast