Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop George Jonathan Dodo

Bishop of Zaria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Apr 1956 BornZuturung Mago
18 Jun 198327.2Ordained PriestPriest
5 Dec 200044.6AppointedBishop of Zaria, Nigeria
3 Mar 200144.9Ordained BishopBishop of Zaria, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for George Jonathan Dodo:
Bishop George Jonathan Dodo (born ) Bishop of Zaria

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Zaria.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 163, Number 13,960

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013