Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Julian Winston Sebastian Fernando, S.S.S.

Bishop of Badulla


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jan 1945 BornMoratuwa
6 Sep 197530.6Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Blessed Sacrament
3 Mar 199752.1AppointedBishop of Badulla, Sri Lanka
14 Jun 199752.4Ordained BishopBishop of Badulla, Sri Lanka

MicroData Summary for Julian Winston Sebastian Fernando:
Bishop Julian Winston Sebastian Fernando S.S.S. (born ) Bishop of Badulla

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Badulla.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Number 13,013
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013