Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Rafael Quirós Quirós

Archbishop of San José de Costa Rica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 May 1955 BornLlano Grande
5 Mar 198125.8Ordained PriestPriest of San José de Costa Rica
2 Dec 200550.6AppointedBishop of Limón, Costa Rica
22 Feb 200650.8Ordained BishopBishop of Limón, Costa Rica
4 Jul 201358.2AppointedArchbishop of San José de Costa Rica
29 Aug 201358.3InstalledArchbishop of San José de Costa Rica

MicroData Summary for José Rafael Quirós Quirós:
Archbishop José Rafael Quirós Quirós (born ) Archbishop of San José de Costa Rica

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of San José de Costa Rica.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 2 Dec 2005
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 184, Number 15,067
  • ab: Bollettino, 4 Jul 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 16 Mar 2014