Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edward Aleksander Wladyslaw O’Rourke

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Gdańsk

Titular Bishop of Sophene


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Oct 1876BornBasin, Poland
27 Oct 190731.0Ordained PriestPriest of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania
29 Sep 191841.9AppointedBishop of Riga, Latvia
15 Dec 191842.1Ordained BishopBishop of Riga, Latvia
10 Apr 192043.4ResignedBishop of Riga, Latvia
10 Apr 192043.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Canea
8 Dec 192044.1AppointedApostolic Delegate to Lithuania
8 Dec 192044.1AppointedApostolic Delegate to Latvia
8 Dec 192044.1AppointedApostolic Delegate to Estonia
Dec 1921³45.0ResignedApostolic Delegate to Lithuania
Dec 1921³45.0ResignedApostolic Delegate to Latvia
Dec 1921³45.0ResignedApostolic Delegate to Estonia
21 Apr 192245.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Gdańsk, Poland
21 Dec 192246.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Pergamum
2 Jan 192649.1AppointedBishop of Gdańsk, Poland
13 Jun 193861.6ResignedBishop of Gdańsk, Poland
13 Jun 193861.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Sophene
27 Jun 194366.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Gdańsk, Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Edward Aleksander Wladyslaw O’Rourke:
Bishop Edward Aleksander Wladyslaw O’Rourke (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Gdańsk

  • a priest for 35.6 years
  • a bishop for 24.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Number 12,814
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1918, Number 66

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015