Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Kasper Felicjan Cyrtowt

Deceased

Bishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jun 1841Born
10 Mar 186725.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania
16 Mar 186826.7Ordained PriestPriest of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania
2 Aug 189756.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania
2 Aug 189756.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Castoria
12 Dec 189756.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Castoria
7 Apr 191068.8AppointedBishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania
20 Sep 191372.3DiedBishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania

MicroData Summary for Kasper Felicjan Cyrtowt
Bishop Kasper Felicjan Cyrtowt (born , died ) Bishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOysiana, Diocese of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź)
Ordained BishopSte. Catherine, St. Petersbourg

  • a priest for 45.5 years
  • a bishop for 15.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Number 12,805
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 190
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1897, Number 59

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018