Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Wau

Dioecesis Vavensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Rudolf Deng Majak, Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 12 December 1974
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Juba
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: South Sudan
  • Square Kilometers: 134,572 (51,978 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: P.O. Box 29, Wau, Sud Sudan
  • Telephone: (914)93.98.92

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Bahr el-Ghazal
30 May 1913ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Central Africa {Africa Centrale} Prefecture Apostolic of Bahr el-Ghazal (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Bahr el-Ghazal
13 June 1917ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Bahr el-Ghazal Vicariate Apostolic of Bahr el-Ghazal
12 June 1923Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Bahr el-Ghazal Prefecture Apostolic of Nilo Equatoriale (erected)
3 March 1949Territory LostPrefecture Apostolic of Bahr el-Gebel
Vicariate Apostolic of Bahr el-Ghazal
Prefecture Apostolic of Mupoi (erected)
3 July 1955Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Bahr el-Gebel
Vicariate Apostolic of Bahr el-Ghazal
Prefecture Apostolic of Mupoi
Vicariate Apostolic of Rumbek (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Wau
26 May 1961Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Bahr el-Ghazal Vicariate Apostolic of Wau
Diocese of Wau
12 December 1974ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Wau Diocese of Wau

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Bahr el-Ghazal
195022,000750,0002.9%337,333543711ap1951
Vicariate Apostolic of Wau
197067,000962,5047.0%10106,70011013ap1971
Diocese of Wau
1980212,1801,398,00015.2%158239,225141015ap1981
1990477,0001,770,00026.9%591434,071221715ap1991
1999760,0002,450,00031.0%1071744,705151316ap2000
2000990,0003,000,00033.0%19113033,000211521ap2001
20011,190,0003,500,00034.0%20103039,666201620ap2002
20021,190,0003,500,00034.0%1361962,631151517ap2005
20102,800,0004,000,00070.0%19123190,322301913ap2011
20122,800,0004,200,00066.7%22143677,777272314ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 24 Dec 2013