Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Revollo Crespo, C.M.F. †

Deceased

Coadjutor Bishop Emeritus of Bolivia, Military


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jun 1925Born
25 Dec 195227.5Ordained PriestPriest of Missionary Sons of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
4 Apr 198559.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cochabamba, Bolivia
4 Apr 198559.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Casae in Numidia
29 Jun 198560.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Casae in Numidia
18 Sep 199368.2AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Bolivia, Military
7 Mar 199872.7ResignedTitular Bishop of Casae in Numidia
14 Apr 200074.8RetiredCoadjutor Bishop of Bolivia, Military
26 Oct 201489.3DiedCoadjutor Bishop Emeritus of Bolivia, Military

MicroData Summary for Manuel Revollo Crespo
Bishop Manuel Revollo Crespo C.M.F. (born , died ) Coadjutor Bishop Emeritus of Bolivia, Military

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSantiago de Machaca

  • a priest for 61.8 years
  • a bishop for 29.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 26 Oct 2014
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast