Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eugenio Coter

Vicar Apostolic of Pando

Titular Bishop of Thibiuca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jul 1957 BornGazzaniga, Italy
20 Jun 198123.9Ordained PriestPriest of Bergamo, Italy
2 Feb 201355.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Pando, Bolivia
2 Feb 201355.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Thibiuca
24 Apr 201355.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thibiuca

MicroData Summary for Eugenio Coter:
Bishop Eugenio Coter (born ) Vicar Apostolic of Pando

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of Pando.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 2 Feb 2013
  • c2+: CB, 25 Apr 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,770

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013