Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Iledfonso Núñez de Haro y Peralta

Deceased

Archbishop of México, Federal District


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Oct 1729BornVillagarcía del Llano, Spain
30 Mar 177242.4AppointedArchbishop of México, Federal District
13 Sep 177242.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of México, Federal District
23 Sep 177242.9InstalledArchbishop of México, Federal District
26 May 180070.6DiedArchbishop of México, Federal District

MicroData Summary for Iledfonso Núñez de Haro y Peralta:
Archbishop Iledfonso Núñez de Haro y Peralta (born , died ) Archbishop of México

  • a bishop for 27.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 288
  • ob/obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 90, Number 457

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 27 Oct 2013