Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel Anselmo Álvarez de Abreu y Valdéz

Deceased

Bishop of Antequera, Oaxaca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1711²BornLa Laguna, Spain
22 Sep 174938.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México
22 Sep 174938.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Cisamus
20 Jun 175140.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cisamus
22 Apr 176554.3AppointedBishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México
17 Jul 177463.5DiedBishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Miguel Anselmo Álvarez de Abreu y Valdéz:
Bishop Miguel Anselmo Álvarez de Abreu y Valdéz (born 1711, died ) Bishop of Antequera, Oaxaca

  • a bishop for 23.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 86, and Page 166
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 452
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 69, Number 332
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1751, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 13 Dec 2015