Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Damían Martínez de Galinzoga, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Tarazona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Feb 1740BornLorca, Murcia, Spain
21 Feb 179454.0AppointedBishop of Sonora, México
31 Aug 179454.5Ordained BishopBishop of Sonora, México
18 Dec 179555.8AppointedBishop of Tarazona, Spain
10 Aug 180262.5DiedBishop of Tarazona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Damían Martínez de Galinzoga:
Bishop Damían Martínez de Galinzoga O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Tarazona

  • a bishop for 7.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 199, Number 16,217
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 384, and Page 409
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 111, Number 582

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 27 Oct 2013