Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dominic Nguyên Văn Manh

Coadjutor Bishop of Đà Lạt, Viet Nam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Aug 1955 Born
29 May 199438.7Ordained PriestPriest of Đà Lạt, Viet Nam
8 Apr 201761.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Đà Lạt, Viet Nam
31 May 201761.8Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Đà Lạt, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Dominic Nguyên Văn Manh
Bishop Dominic Nguyên Văn Manh (born ) Coadjutor Bishop of Đà Lạt

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCan Tho
Ordained BishopCentre pastoral diocésain, Đà Lạt, Diocese of Đà Lạt

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Đà Lạt.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Apr 2017
  • c1: CB, 8 Apr 2017
  • ob: CB, 21 Apr 2017
  • c2+: CB, 30 May 2017
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 232, Number 19,437

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 27 Jun 2018

Quantcast