Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dominique Nguyên Chu Trinh

Bishop Emeritus of Xuân Lộc, Viet Nam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 May 1940 Born
29 Apr 196625.9Ordained PriestPriest of Xuân Lộc, Viet Nam
30 Sep 200464.3AppointedBishop of Xuân Lộc, Viet Nam
11 Nov 200464.4Ordained BishopBishop of Xuân Lộc, Viet Nam
7 May 201675.9RetiredBishop of Xuân Lộc, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Dominique Nguyên Chu Trinh
Bishop Dominique Nguyên Chu Trinh (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Xuân Lộc

EventPlace
Birth PlacePhu Nhai

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Xuân Lộc.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Number 14,713
  • r: Bollettino, 7 May 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast