Date | Age | Event | Title |
---|---|---|---|
25 May 1965 | Born | ||
30 Jun 1999 | 34.0 | Ordained Priest | Priest of Thành-Phô Hồ Chí Minh (Hôchiminh Ville), Viet Nam |
1 Nov 2022 | 57.4 | Appointed | Auxiliary Bishop of Thành-Phô Hồ Chí Minh (Hôchiminh Ville), Viet Nam |
1 Nov 2022 | 57.4 | Appointed | Titular Bishop of Arsennaria |
3 Jan 2023 | 57.6 | Ordained Bishop | Titular Bishop of Arsennaria |
(WikiData: Q115035474)
Bishop
Joseph
Bùi Công Trác
(born )
Auxiliary Bishop
of Thành-Phô Hồ Chí Minh (Hôchiminh Ville)
Event | Place |
---|---|
Birth Place | Ðà Lạt, Diocese of Ðà Lạt |
Ordained Bishop | Archdiocesan Pastoral Center, Thành-Phô Hồ Chí Minh, Archdiocese of Thành-Phô Hồ Chí Minh (Hôchiminh Ville) |
Source(s):
|
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024 Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 25 Feb 2024 |
✠