Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Đo Văn Ngân

Auxiliary Bishop of Xuân Lộc, Viet Nam

Titular Bishop of Buleliana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jun 1953 Born
14 Jan 199238.6Ordained PriestPriest of Xuân Lộc, Viet Nam
2 May 201763.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Xuân Lộc, Viet Nam
2 May 201763.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Buleliana
1 Jun 201763.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Buleliana

MicroData Summary for John Đo Văn Ngân
Bishop John Đo Văn Ngân (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Xuân Lộc

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNinh Dinh, Vicariate Apostolic of Phát Diêm
Ordained BishopSt. Joseph, Seminary, Xuân Lộc, Diocese of Xuân Lộc

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Xuân Lộc.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 2 May 2017
  • ob: CB, 2 May 2017
  • c24: CB, 31 May 2017
  • c3: CB, 1 Jun 2017
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 232, Number 19,438

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast