Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Nguyen Duc Cuong

Bishop of Thanh Hoá, Viet Nam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Oct 1953 Born
27 Jun 199238.7Ordained PriestPriest of Đà Lạt, Viet Nam
25 Apr 201864.5AppointedBishop of Thanh Hoá, Viet Nam
27 Jun 201864.7Ordained BishopBishop of Thanh Hoá, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Joseph Nguyen Duc Cuong
Bishop Joseph Nguyen Duc Cuong (born ) Bishop of Thanh Hoá

EventPlace
Birth PlaceQuang Truong, Diocese of Thanh Hoá
Ordained BishopThanh Hoá, Diocese of Thanh Hoá

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Thanh Hoá.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Apr 2018
  • ob: CB, 25 Apr 2018
  • c2+: CB, 26 Jun 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 27 Jun 2018

Quantcast