Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Huynh Văn Hai

Bishop of Vĩnh Long, Viet Nam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 May 1954 Born
6 Jan 199338.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Vĩnh Long, Viet Nam
31 Aug 199440.2Ordained PriestPriest of Vĩnh Long, Viet Nam
7 Oct 201561.3AppointedBishop of Vĩnh Long, Viet Nam
11 Dec 201561.5Ordained BishopBishop of Vĩnh Long, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Peter Huynh Văn Hai
Bishop Peter Huynh Văn Hai (born ) Bishop of Vĩnh Long

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBen Tre

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Vĩnh Long.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 Oct 2015
  • od/c01: CB, 13 Oct 2015
  • ob: CB, 25 Nov 2015
  • c2+: CB, 10 Dec 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Number 18,686

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast