Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph Ngô Quang Kiêt

Archbishop Emeritus of Hà Nội, Viet Nam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Sep 1952 Born
31 May 199138.7Ordained PriestPriest of Lạng Sơn et Cao Bằng, Viet Nam
3 Jun 199946.7AppointedBishop of Lạng Sơn et Cao Bằng, Viet Nam
29 Jun 199946.8Ordained BishopBishop of Lạng Sơn et Cao Bằng, Viet Nam
26 Apr 200350.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Hà Nội, Viet Nam
19 Feb 200552.4AppointedArchbishop of Hà Nội, Viet Nam
19 Mar 200552.5InstalledArchbishop of Hà Nội, Viet Nam
13 May 201057.6ResignedArchbishop of Hà Nội, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Joseph Ngô Quang Kiêt
Archbishop Joseph Ngô Quang Kiêt (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Hà Nội

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMy Són

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Hà Nội.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 13 May 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 155, Number 13,576
  • c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 156, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast