Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Lang Sn et Cao Bang

Dioecesis Langsonensis et Caobangensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 24 November 1960
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of H Ni
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Vit Nam
  • Square Kilometers: 17,815 (6,881 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Toa Giam Muc, Xu Cua Nam, Phuong Chi Lang, Tx. Lang Son, Viet Nam
  • Telephone: (025)810.367
  • Fax: 810.632

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Lang Sn et Cao Bang
31 December 1913ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Lang Sn et Cao Bang (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Lang Sn et Cao Bang
11 July 1939ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Lang Sn et Cao Bang Vicariate Apostolic of Lang Sn et Cao Bang
Diocese of Lang Sn et Cao Bang
24 November 1960ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Lang Sn et Cao Bang Diocese of Lang Sn et Cao Bang

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Lang Sn et Cao Bang
1950129210359ap1951
Diocese of Lang Sn et Cao Bang
19632,50044625711ap1991
19995,0001,700,000.3%99555113ap2000
20005,5831,550,000.4%99620712ap2001
20015,6701,129,400.5%88708813ap2002
20025,8001,150,000.5%222,900714ap2003
20035,9281,159,000.5%331,976810ap2004
20046,0781,153,000.5%441,519711ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.8.1, 5 Sep 2012; data: 24 Sep 2012