Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre Nguyễn Huy Mai

Deceased

Bishop of Ban Mê Thuột, Viet Nam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jul 1913Born
21 Dec 194027.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Hà Nôi, Viet Nam
29 Jun 194127.9Ordained PriestPriest of Hà Nôi, Viet Nam
22 Jun 196753.9AppointedBishop of Ban Mê Thuột, Viet Nam
15 Aug 196754.1Ordained BishopBishop of Ban Mê Thuột, Viet Nam
4 Aug 199077.0DiedBishop of Ban Mê Thuột, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Pierre Nguyễn Huy Mai
Bishop Pierre Nguyễn Huy Mai (born , died ) Bishop of Ban Mê Thuột

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKhuyèn Luong
Ordained DeaconSaint-Sulpice, Church, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained PriestNotre-Dame, Cathedral, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France

  • a priest for 49.0 years
  • a bishop for 22.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125
  • od/c01/loc: AJ, 17 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.8, 28 Mar 2020; Data: 4 Apr 2020

Quantcast