Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Richard Garth Henning

Auxiliary Bishop of Rockville Centre, New York, USA

Titular Bishop of Tabla


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Oct 1964 Born
30 May 199227.6Ordained PriestPriest of Rockville Centre, New York, USA
8 Jun 201853.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Rockville Centre, New York, USA
8 Jun 201853.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Tabla
24 Jul 201853.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tabla

MicroData Summary for Richard Garth Henning
Bishop Richard Garth Henning (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Rockville Centre

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRockville Centre, Diocese of Rockville Centre, New York
Ordained BishopSt. Agnes, Cathedral, Rockville Centre, Diocese of Rockville Centre, New York

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Rockville Centre.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Jun 2018
  • ob/c12: CB, 8 Jun 2018
  • c34: CB, 20 Jul 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 237, Number 19,825

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast