Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert John Brennan

Bishop of Columbus, Ohio, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jun 1962 Born
27 May 198926.9Ordained PriestPriest of Rockville Centre, New York, USA
8 Jun 201250.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Rockville Centre, New York, USA
8 Jun 201250.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Erdonia
25 Jul 201250.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Erdonia
31 Jan 201956.6AppointedBishop of Columbus, Ohio, USA
29 Mar 201956.8InstalledBishop of Columbus, Ohio, USA

MicroData Summary for Robert John Brennan
Bishop Robert John Brennan (born ) Bishop of Columbus

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBronx, NY, Archdiocese of New York, New York
Ordained PriestSaint Agnes, Cathedral, Rockville Centre, Diocese of Rockville Centre, New York
Ordained BishopSaint Agnes, Cathedral, Rockville Centre, Diocese of Rockville Centre, New York

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Columbus.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Jun 2012
  • ob/c12: Website of the Diocese, 8 Jun 2012
  • c34: CB, 25 Jul 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Number 17,510
  • ab: Bollettino, 31 Jan 2019
  • i: CB, 31 Jan 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 2 Feb 2019

Quantcast