Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Joseph Coyle

Auxiliary Bishop of Rockville Centre, New York, USA

Titular Bishop of Zabi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Sep 1964 Born
25 May 199126.6Ordained PriestPriest of Rockville Centre, New York, USA
11 Feb 201348.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of United States of America, Military
11 Feb 201348.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Zabi
25 Apr 201348.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zabi
20 Feb 201853.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Rockville Centre, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for Robert Joseph Coyle
Bishop Robert Joseph Coyle (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Rockville Centre

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrooklyn, NY, Diocese of Brooklyn, New York
Ordained BishopImmaculate Conception, National Shrine, Basilica, Washington, DC, Archdiocese of Washington, District of Columbia

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Rockville Centre.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 Feb 2013
  • ob/c2: CB, 11 Feb 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,772
  • ab: Bollettino, 20 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast