Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Witold Mroziewski

Auxiliary Bishop of Brooklyn, New York

Titular Bishop of Walla Walla


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1966 BornAugustow, Poland
29 Jun 199125.2Ordained PriestPriest of Łomża, Poland
2001²34.7IncardinatedPriest of Brooklyn, New York, USA
19 May 201549.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Brooklyn, New York, USA
19 May 201549.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Walla Walla
20 Jul 201549.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Walla Walla

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Witold Mroziewski:
Bishop Witold Mroziewski (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Brooklyn

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Brooklyn.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 May 2015
  • ob/c12: CB, 19 May 2015
  • c34: CB, 14 Jul 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 224, Number 18,550

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015