Catholic-Hierarchy DC

William Wakefield Cardinal Baum

Deceased

Major Penitentiary Emeritus of the Apostolic Penitentiary

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in via Flaminia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Nov 1926BornDallas, TX
12 May 195124.4Ordained PriestPriest of Kansas City, Missouri, USA
18 Feb 197043.2AppointedBishop of Springfield-Cape Girardeau, Missouri, USA
6 Apr 197043.3Ordained BishopBishop of Springfield-Cape Girardeau, Missouri, USA
5 Mar 197346.2AppointedArchbishop of Washington, District of Columbia, USA
9 May 197346.4InstalledArchbishop of Washington, District of Columbia, USA
24 May 197649.5Elevated to Cardinal
24 May 197649.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in via Flaminia
15 Jan 198053.1AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for Catholic Education (for Institutes of Study)
18 Mar 198053.3ResignedArchbishop of Washington, District of Columbia, USA
6 Apr 199063.3AppointedMajor Penitentiary of the Apostolic Penitentiary
22 Nov 200175.0RetiredMajor Penitentiary of the Apostolic Penitentiary
23 Jul 201588.6DiedMajor Penitentiary Emeritus of the Apostolic Penitentiary

MicroData Summary for William Wakefield Baum (VIAF: 62835849)
William Wakefield Cardinal Baum (born , died ) Major Penitentiary Emeritus of Apostolic Penitentiary

  • a priest for 64.1 years
  • a bishop for 45.2 years
  • a cardinal for 39.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • d: CB, 23 Jul 2015
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 224, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 9 Dec 2016