Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrzej Jerzy Zglejszewski

Auxiliary Bishop of Rockville Centre, New York

Titular Bishop of Nicives


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Dec 1961 BornCzarna Bialostocka, Poland
26 May 199028.4Ordained PriestPriest of Rockville Centre, New York, USA
11 Feb 201452.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Rockville Centre, New York, USA
11 Feb 201452.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Nicives
25 Mar 201452.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nicives

MicroData Summary for Andrzej Jerzy Zglejszewski:
Bishop Andrzej Jerzy Zglejszewski (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Rockville Centre

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Rockville Centre.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 Feb 2014
  • ob/c2: CB, 11 Feb 2014
  • c34: CB, 24 Mar 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 25 Mar 2014