Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edward Patrick Allen

Deceased

Bishop of Mobile, Alabama, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Mar 1853Born
17 Dec 188128.7Ordained PriestPriest of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
26 Jan 189743.8AppointedBishop of Mobile, Alabama, USA
16 May 189744.1Ordained BishopBishop of Mobile, Alabama, USA
21 Oct 192673.5DiedBishop of Mobile, Alabama, USA

MicroData Summary for Edward Patrick Allen
Bishop Edward Patrick Allen (born , died ) Bishop of Mobile

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLowell, Archdiocese of Boston, Massachusetts
Ordained BishopAssumption, Cathedral, Baltimore, Archdiocese of Baltimore, Maryland
Death PlaceMobile, Diocese of Mobile, Alabama

  • a priest for 44.8 years
  • a bishop for 29.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 388
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1897, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017