Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Luis Miguel Romero Fernández, M. Id.

Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Rockville Centre, New York, USA

Titular Bishop of Egara

Titular See: Istituto di Cristo Redentore (Missionari Identes)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jun 1954 Born
11 Sep 198127.2Ordained PriestPriest
3 Mar 202065.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Rockville Centre, New York, USA
3 Mar 202065.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Egara
29 Jun 202066.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Egara

MicroData Summary for Luis Miguel Romero Fernández
Father Luis Miguel Romero Fernández M. Id. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Rockville Centre

EventPlace
Birth PlacePalencia, Diocese of Palencia, Spain
Ordained PriestTenerife, Spain
Ordained BishopSaint Agnes, Cathedral, Rockville Centre, Diocese of Rockville Centre, New York

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Rockville Centre.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Mar 2020
  • ob/c2+: CB, 3 Mar 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 12 May 2020

Quantcast