Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lawrence Joseph Riley

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Boston, Massachusetts, USA

Titular Bishop of Daimlaig


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Sep 1914Born
21 Sep 194026.0Ordained PriestPriest of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
7 Dec 197157.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
7 Dec 197157.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Daimlaig
2 Feb 197257.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Daimlaig
22 Jan 199075.3RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
2 Dec 200187.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Boston, Massachusetts, USA

MicroData Summary for Lawrence Joseph Riley
Bishop Lawrence Joseph Riley (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Boston

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBoston

  • a priest for 61.1 years
  • a bishop for 29.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast