Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Joseph Mulcahy

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Boston, Massachusetts, USA

Titular Bishop of Penafiel


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jun 1922Born
1 May 194724.8Ordained PriestPriest of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
28 Dec 197452.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
28 Dec 197452.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Penafiel
11 Feb 197552.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Penafiel
21 Jul 199270.0ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
26 Apr 199471.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Boston, Massachusetts, USA

MicroData Summary for John Joseph Mulcahy
Bishop John Joseph Mulcahy (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Boston

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDorchester, MA

  • a priest for 46.9 years
  • a bishop for 19.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast