Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Joseph Gerrard

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Fall River, Massachusetts

Titular Bishop of Forma


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jun 1897BornNew Bedford
26 May 192326.0Ordained PriestPriest of Fall River, Massachusetts, USA
2 Feb 195961.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Fall River, Massachusetts, USA
2 Feb 195961.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Forma
19 Mar 195961.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Forma
12 Jan 197678.6RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Fall River, Massachusetts, USA
3 Jun 199194.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Fall River, Massachusetts, USA

MicroData Summary for James Joseph Gerrard:
Bishop James Joseph Gerrard (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Fall River

  • a priest for 68.0 years
  • a bishop for 32.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1959, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013