Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Daniel Anthony Hart

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Norwich, Connecticut, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Aug 1927Born
2 Feb 195325.4Ordained PriestPriest of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
24 Aug 197649.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
24 Aug 197649.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Tepelta
18 Oct 197649.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tepelta
12 Sep 199568.0AppointedBishop of Norwich, Connecticut, USA
1 Nov 199568.1InstalledBishop of Norwich, Connecticut, USA
11 Mar 200375.5RetiredBishop of Norwich, Connecticut, USA
14 Jan 200880.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Norwich, Connecticut, USA

MicroData Summary for Daniel Anthony Hart
Bishop Daniel Anthony Hart (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Norwich

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLawrence

  • a priest for 54.9 years
  • a bishop for 31.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast