Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Peter Deeley

Bishop of Portland, Maine, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jun 1946 Born
14 Jul 197327.0Ordained PriestPriest of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
9 Nov 201266.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
9 Nov 201266.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Kearney
4 Jan 201366.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Kearney
18 Dec 201367.5AppointedBishop of Portland, Maine, USA
14 Feb 201467.6InstalledBishop of Portland, Maine, USA

MicroData Summary for Robert Peter Deeley
Bishop Robert Peter Deeley (born ) Bishop of Portland

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCambridge
Ordained BishopHoly Cross, Cathedral, Boston, Archdiocese of Boston, Massachusetts

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Portland.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 9 Nov 2012
  • ob/c2+: CB, 21 Nov 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Number 17,620
  • ab: Bollettino, 18 Dec 2013
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations …piscopales, Issue 2013, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018