Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph John Ruocco

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Boston, Massachusetts, USA

Titular Bishop of Polinianum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Apr 1922Born
6 May 194826.0Ordained PriestPriest of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
28 Dec 197452.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
28 Dec 197452.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Polinianum
11 Feb 197552.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Polinianum
26 Jul 198058.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Boston, Massachusetts, USA

MicroData Summary for Joseph John Ruocco
Bishop Joseph John Ruocco (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Boston

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBoston

  • a priest for 32.2 years
  • a bishop for 5.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast