Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father John P. Dolan

Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of San Diego, California, USA

Titular Bishop of Uchi Maius


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jun 1962 Born
1 Jul 198927.0Ordained PriestPriest of San Diego, California, USA
19 Apr 201754.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Diego, California, USA
19 Apr 201754.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Uchi Maius
8 Jun 201755.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Uchi Maius

MicroData Summary for John P. Dolan
Father John P. Dolan (born ) Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of San Diego

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Diego, Diocese of San Diego, California
Ordained PriestSan Rafael, Rancho Bernardo, Diocese of San Diego, California
Ordained BishopSaint Therese of Carmel, Del Mar, Diocese of San Diego, California

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of San Diego.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 Apr 2017
  • ob/loc/c1: CB, 19 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 20 Apr 2017