Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martin David Holley

Bishop Emeritus of Memphis, Tennessee, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Dec 1954 Born
8 May 198732.3Ordained PriestPriest of Pensacola-Tallahassee, Florida, USA
18 May 200449.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Washington, District of Columbia, USA
18 May 200449.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Rusibisir
2 Jul 200449.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rusibisir
23 Aug 201661.6AppointedBishop of Memphis, Tennessee, USA
19 Oct 201661.8InstalledBishop of Memphis, Tennessee, USA
24 Oct 201863.8RemovedBishop of Memphis, Tennessee, USA

MicroData Summary for Martin David Holley
Bishop Martin David Holley (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Memphis

EventPlace
Birth PlacePensacola, FL
Ordained BishopSaint Matthew the Apostle, Cathedral, Washington, DC, Archdiocese of Washington, District of Columbia

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Memphis.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 176, Number 14,647
  • ab: Bollettino, 23 Aug 2016
  • i: CB, 23 Aug 2016
  • r: CB, 23 Oct 2018
  • r: Bollettino, 24 Oct 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 24 Oct 2018

Quantcast