Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Xavier Irwin

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Boston, Massachusetts, USA

Titular Bishop of Ubaza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jan 1934Born
2 Feb 196026.0Ordained PriestPriest of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
24 Jul 199662.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
24 Jul 199662.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Ubaza
17 Sep 199662.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ubaza
20 Oct 200975.7RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
30 Oct 201985.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Boston, Massachusetts, USA

MicroData Summary for Francis Xavier Irwin
Bishop Francis Xavier Irwin (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Boston

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMedford, Archdiocese of Boston, Massachusetts
Ordained BishopHoly Cross, Cathedral, Boston, Archdiocese of Boston, Massachusetts
Death PlaceDennis, Archdiocese of Boston, Massachusetts

  • a priest for 59.7 years
  • a bishop for 23.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 20 Oct 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146, Number 12,793
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 31 Oct 2019
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast