Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop João José Burke, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Miracema do Tocantins, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Mar 1935Born
25 Feb 196125.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
4 Jan 199559.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Miracema do Tocantins, Brazil
25 Mar 199560.0Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Miracema do Tocantins, Brazil
14 Feb 199660.9SucceededBishop of Miracema do Tocantins, Brazil
14 Mar 200670.9DiedBishop of Miracema do Tocantins, Brazil

MicroData Summary for João José Burke
Bishop João José Burke O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Miracema do Tocantins

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTeaneck

  • a priest for 45.0 years
  • a bishop for 10.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Number 12,499
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast