Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrick Vincent Ahern

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of New York, New York, USA

Titular Bishop of Naiera


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Mar 1919Born
27 Jan 194525.8Ordained PriestPriest of New York, New York, USA
3 Feb 197050.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of New York, New York, USA
3 Feb 197050.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Naiera
19 Mar 197051.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Naiera
26 Apr 199475.1RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of New York, New York, USA
19 Mar 201192.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of New York, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for Patrick Vincent Ahern (VIAF: 4102630)
Bishop Patrick Vincent Ahern (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of New York

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNew York

  • a priest for 66.1 years
  • a bishop for 41.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018