Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Joseph Bransfield

Bishop Emeritus of Wheeling-Charleston, West Virginia, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Sep 1943 Born
15 May 197127.6Ordained PriestPriest of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
9 Dec 200461.2AppointedBishop of Wheeling-Charleston, West Virginia, USA
22 Feb 200561.4Ordained BishopBishop of Wheeling-Charleston, West Virginia, USA
13 Sep 201875.0RetiredBishop of Wheeling-Charleston, West Virginia, USA

MicroData Summary for Michael Joseph Bransfield (VIAF: 163874367)
Bishop Michael Joseph Bransfield (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Wheeling-Charleston

EventPlace
Birth PlacePhiladelphia, Archdiocese of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania
Ordained BishopSaint Joseph, Cathedral, Wheeling, Diocese of Wheeling-Charleston, West Virginia

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Wheeling-Charleston.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 178, Number 14,826
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 231, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 13 Sep 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.1, 12 Sep 2018; Data: 13 Sep 2018

Quantcast