Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emilio Simeón Allué Carcasona, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Boston, Massachusetts, USA

Titular Bishop of Croae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Feb 1935Born
22 Dec 196631.8Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
24 Jul 199661.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
24 Jul 199661.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Croae
17 Sep 199661.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Croae
30 Jun 201075.3RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
26 Apr 202085.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Boston, Massachusetts, USA

MicroData Summary for Emilio Simeón Allué Carcasona (VIAF: 166648250)
Bishop Emilio Simeón Allué Carcasona S.D.B. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Boston

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHuesca, Spain
Ordained BishopHoly Cross, Cathedral, Boston, Archdiocese of Boston, Massachusetts
Death PlaceSt. Elizabeth, Hospital, Boston, Archdiocese of Boston, Massachusetts
Buried Place (Original)Salesian, Cemetery, Goshen, NY

  • a priest for 53.3 years
  • a bishop for 23.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 30 Jun 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146, Number 12,794
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ln: CB, 19 Apr 2020
  • d: CB, 26 Apr 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast