Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Gaspard Cardinal Mermillod

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Lausanne et Genève

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Sep 1824BornCarouge
24 Jun 184722.8Ordained PriestPriest of Lausanne et Genève, Switzerland
22 Sep 186440.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lausanne et Genève, Switzerland
22 Sep 186440.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Hebron
25 Sep 186440.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hebron
15 Mar 188358.5AppointedBishop of Lausanne et Genève, Switzerland
23 Jun 189065.8Elevated to Cardinal
26 Jun 189065.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo
11 Mar 189166.5ResignedBishop of Lausanne et Genève, Switzerland
23 Feb 189267.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Lausanne et Genève, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Gaspard Mermillod:
Cardinal Gaspard Mermillod (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Lausanne et Genève

  • a priest for 44.7 years
  • a bishop for 27.4 years
  • a cardinal for 1.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 300, and Page 335
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 51
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 23 Jun 1890

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013