Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Aloysius John Wycislo

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Green Bay, Wisconsin, USA


Motto: Caritati Instate


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jun 1908Born
7 Apr 193425.8Ordained PriestPriest of Chicago, Illinois, USA
7 Oct 196052.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA
7 Oct 196052.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Stadia
21 Dec 196052.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Stadia
4 Mar 196859.7AppointedBishop of Green Bay, Wisconsin, USA
16 Apr 196859.8InstalledBishop of Green Bay, Wisconsin, USA
10 May 198374.8ResignedBishop of Green Bay, Wisconsin, USA
11 Oct 200597.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Green Bay, Wisconsin, USA

MicroData Summary
Aloysius John Wycislo
Bishop Aloysius John Wycislo
(born , died )
Bishop Emeritus of Green Bay

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChicago, IL, Archdiocese of Chicago, Illinois
Ordained BishopHoly Name, Cathedral, Chicago, IL, Archdiocese of Chicago, Illinois
Death PlaceGreen Bay, Diocese of Green Bay, Wisconsin
Buried Place (Original)Allouez Catholic, Cemetery, Green Bay, Diocese of Green Bay, Wisconsin

  • a priest for 71.5 years
  • a bishop for 44.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1960, Number 126
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Necrology (back)
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 532, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 28 Apr 2025