Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carl Frederick Mengeling

Bishop Emeritus of Lansing, Michigan, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Oct 1930 Born
25 May 195726.5Ordained PriestPriest of Gary, Indiana, USA
7 Nov 199565.0AppointedBishop of Lansing, Michigan, USA
25 Jan 199665.2Ordained BishopBishop of Lansing, Michigan, USA
27 Feb 200877.3RetiredBishop of Lansing, Michigan, USA

MicroData Summary for Carl Frederick Mengeling
Bishop Carl Frederick Mengeling (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Lansing

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHammond

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Lansing.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 27 Feb 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143, Number 12,650

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018