Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jeffrey Marc Monforton

Bishop of Steubenville, Ohio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 May 1963 BornDetroit
25 Jun 199431.1Ordained PriestPriest of Detroit, Michigan, USA
3 Jul 201249.2AppointedBishop of Steubenville, Ohio, USA
10 Sep 201249.3Ordained BishopBishop of Steubenville, Ohio, USA

MicroData Summary for Jeffrey Marc Monforton:
Bishop Jeffrey Marc Monforton (born ) Bishop of Steubenville

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Steubenville.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Jul 2012
  • ob: CB, 5 Jul 2012
  • c2+: CB, 20 Jul 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Number 17,539

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013