Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Leonard Paul Blair

Archbishop of Hartford, Connecticut, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Apr 1949 Born
26 Jun 197627.2Ordained PriestPriest of Detroit, Michigan, USA
9 Jul 199950.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Detroit, Michigan, USA
9 Jul 199950.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Voncariana
24 Aug 199950.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Voncariana
7 Oct 200354.4AppointedBishop of Toledo (in America), Ohio, USA
4 Dec 200354.6InstalledBishop of Toledo (in America), Ohio, USA
29 Oct 201364.5AppointedArchbishop of Hartford, Connecticut, USA
16 Dec 201364.6InstalledArchbishop of Hartford, Connecticut, USA

MicroData Summary for Leonard Paul Blair (VIAF: 288916055)
Archbishop Leonard Paul Blair (born ) Archbishop of Hartford

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDetroit, Archdiocese of Detroit, Michigan
Ordained PriestChapel, Sacred Heart, Seminary, Detroit, Archdiocese of Detroit, Michigan
Ordained BishopMost Blessed Sacrament, Cathedral, Detroit, Archdiocese of Detroit, Michigan

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Hartford.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c1: CB, 7 Nov 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 156, Number 13,599
  • ab: Bollettino, 29 Oct 2013
  • i: CB, 30 Oct 2013
  • op.loc: CB, 29 Oct 2022

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2022
Code: web_b, v3.3.3, 16 Jun 2022; Data: 30 Oct 2022